Global Patent Index - EP 1840283 A2

EP 1840283 A2 2007-10-03 - Closing device of a low-pressure drainage system

Title (en)

Closing device of a low-pressure drainage system

Title (de)

Verschlusseinrichtung einer Unterdruckabwassseranlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage d'une installation d'eaux usées sous pression

Publication

EP 1840283 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07104828 A

Priority

  • DE 102006015480 A
  • DE 202006004908 U

Abstract (en)

The device (60) has a connecting unit, which is provided between a connecting pipe and a connector for a control arrangement of a purge or gate valve. The connecting unit of the closure device is lockable opposite to a low pressure pipe and/or the connecting pipe by using a check valve (100). A tubular or hose-shaped section (102) proceeds from the closure device, and exhibits the check valve on an end side of the tubular or hose-shaped section. The tubular or hose-shaped section extends up to a sewage flowing region of a low pressure sewage system.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Verschlusseinrichtung (60) einer Abzweigung (58) einer mit einer Unterdruckleitung (13) einer Unterdruckabwasseranlage verbundenen Anschlussleitung (18), wobei die Verschlusseinrichtung eine Verbindung zwischen der Anschlussleitung und einem Anschluss (62, 63) für eine Steueranordnung (54) eines Absaugventils (56) aufweist und die Verbindung mittels eines Rückschlagventils (100) gegenüber der Unterdruckleitung bzw. Anschlussleitung absperrbar ist. Um unabhängig von herrschenden Temperaturen auszuschließen, dass ein Eindringen von Wasser in den von dem Rückschlagventil abgesperrten Bereich der Verschlusseinrichtung und somit in die mit dieser verbundenen Steueranordnung erfolgen kann, wird vorgeschlagen, dass von der Verschlusseinrichtung (60) ein sich bis in von Abwasser durchströmten Bereich der Unterdruckabwasseranlage erstreckender rohr- oder schlauchförmiger Abschnitt (102) ausgeht, der endseitig das Rückschlagventil (100) aufweist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 1/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1840283 A2 20071003; EP 1840283 A3 20090624; DE 102006015480 B3 20071011

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130711

2010-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2010-01-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091216

2009-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-06-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROEDIGER VACUUM GMBH

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU