Global Patent Index - EP 1840284 A1

EP 1840284 A1 2007-10-03 - Shower with peristaltic pump to draw off water to the sewer

Title (en)

Shower with peristaltic pump to draw off water to the sewer

Title (de)

Dusche mit Peristaltikpumpe zum Abpumpen des Wassers in den Abfluß

Title (fr)

Douche avec pompe péristaltique pour pomper l'eau vers la purge

Publication

EP 1840284 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07006530 A

Priority

GB 0606391 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a shower installation comprising a shower tray (1), in which water is drawn from the shower tray by a peristaltic pump (7) and discharged to drain. In one embodiment, water collects in a sump (4) in the floor (2) of the shower tray, and is withdrawn from the sump by a suction pipe (5) connected to an inlet port (6) of the peristaltic pump.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/22 (2006.01); F04B 43/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/40 (2013.01); E03C 1/12 (2013.01); E03C 1/22 (2013.01); F04B 43/1253 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • GB 1506697 A 19780412 - BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB
  • GB 2109474 A 19830602 - ELMAR MEDICAL SYSTEMS LTD
  • GB 2294636 A 19960508 - GONTAR ANTONI HAROLD NIKOLAS [GB]
  • GB 2425471 A 20061101 - GONTAR ANTONI HAROLD NIKOLAS [GB], et al
  • US 5846061 A 19981208 - LEDEBUHR RICHARD L [US], et al
  • SHEN M.C.: "Asymptotic theory for peristaltic transport in a tube of arbitrary cross section", PHYSICS OF FLUIDS, vol. 19, no. 2, February 1976 (1976-02-01), pages 213 - 218
  • CLEAN ROOM ENGINEERING: "Misting shower - MS3300 series", WEBPAGE, pages 1, XP003019507, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.cleanroomeng.com/products_misting_shower.cfm>

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

GB 0606391 D0 20060510; GB 2425471 A 20061101; GB 2425471 B 20080625; AT 401468 T 20080815; DE 602007000039 D1 20080828; DK 1840284 T3 20081013; EP 1840284 A1 20071003; EP 1840284 B1 20080716; ES 2309974 T3 20081216; US 2007234474 A1 20071011

INPADOC legal status


2015-06-02 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2015-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-02-11 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20141006

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140329

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140329

2015-01-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602007000039

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-31 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140330

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140329

2014-11-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-10-22 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-20 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602007000039

2014-03-05 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04B 43/12 20060101AFI20140129BHEP

2014-03-05 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E03C 1/12 20060101ALI20140129BHEP

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2013-10-23 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DLP LIMITED

- Effective date: 20090128

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130327

- Year of fee payment: 7

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 7

2013-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130103

- Year of fee payment: 7

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130206

- Year of fee payment: 7

2013-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20130325

- Year of fee payment: 7

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130318

- Year of fee payment: 7

2012-11-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DLP LIMITED

- Effective date: 20090128

2012-09-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: H2O PUMPS LIMITED

2012-08-13 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: H20 PUMPS LIMITED

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-06-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: H2O PUMPS LIMITED

2012-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2012-04-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WEIGHTCO 2011 (8) LIMITED

2012-04-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: H2O PUMPS LTD., GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ANTONI HAROLD NIKOLAS GONTAR,FREDERICK JAMES TAYLOR,JONATHAN ROBERT TAYLOR, , GB

- Document: DE 602007000039

- Effective date: 20120224

2012-04-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: H2O PUMPS LTD., WINSFORD, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ANTONI HAROLD NIKOLAS GONTAR,FREDERICK JAMES TAYLOR,JONATHAN ROBERT TAYLOR, , GB

- Document: DE 602007000039

- Effective date: 20120224

2012-04-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: H2O PUMPS LTD., WINSFORD, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: GONTAR, ANTONI HAROLD NIKOLAS, PEVENSEY, EAST SUSSEX, GB; TAYLOR, FREDERICK JAMES, WILLINGDON, EAST SUSSEX, GB; TAYLOR, JONATHAN ROBERT, WILLINGDON, EAST SUSSEX, GB

- Document: DE 602007000039

- Effective date: 20120224

2012-04-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007000039

- Representative's name: BOHMANN, DE

- Effective date: 20120321

2012-04-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007000039

- Representative's name: BOHMANN, DE

- Effective date: 20120224

2012-04-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: WEIGHT CO 2011 LIMITED, GB

- Effective date: 20120306

2012-03-14 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20120307

2012-03-14 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20120307

2012-02-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007000039

- Representative's name: JAKOBY RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2012-01-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20111222 AND 20111223

2011-12-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: WEITERBEHANDLUNG GUTGEHEISSEN

2011-12-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: H2O PUMPS LIMITED

- Free text: TAYLOR, FREDERICK JAMES#COMBE END TAS COMBE WAY WILLINGDON#EAST SUSSEX BN20 9JA (GB) $ TAYLOR, JONATHAN ROBERT#COMBE END TAS COMBE WAY WILLINGDON#EAST SUSSEX BN20 9JA (GB) $ GONTAR, ANTONI HAROLD NIKOLAS# #14 VAL PRINCEPS ROAD PEVENSEY BAY PEVENSEY EAST SUSSEX BN24 6JH (GB) -TRANSFER TO- H2O PUMPS LIMITED#C/O CONTOUR SHOWERS LIMITED FACTORY SIDDORN STREET#WINSFORD, CHESHIRE CW7 2BA (GB)

2011-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080716

2011-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080716

2011-06-30 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090117

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090329

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081017

2010-05-31 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080716

2009-10-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080716

2009-05-29 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080716

2009-05-29 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080716

2009-05-29 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080716

2009-05-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DLP LIMITED

2009-04-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080716

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080716

2009-03-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DLP LIMITED

- Effective date: 20090128

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080716

2009-02-27 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081016

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080716

2009-02-27 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080716

2009-02-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081216

2009-02-27 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080716

2009-01-30 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081116

2009-01-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080716

2008-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2309974 T3

2008-10-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-09-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-09-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602007000039 P 20080828

2008-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GONTAR, ANTONI HAROLD NIKOLAS

2008-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TAYLOR, FREDERICK JAMES

2008-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TAYLOR, JONATHAN ROBERT

2008-06-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GONTAR, ANTONI HAROLD NIKOLAS

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071128

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070816

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU