Global Patent Index - EP 1840295 A2

EP 1840295 A2 2007-10-03 - Plastics or metal strips for ventilating roofs

Title (en)

Plastics or metal strips for ventilating roofs

Title (de)

Kunststoff- oder Metallstreifen zur Belüftung von Dächern

Title (fr)

Bandes plastiques ou métalliques pour la ventilation de toit

Publication

EP 1840295 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07405073 A

Priority

CH 4912006 A

Abstract (en)

System of metal or plastics strips (6) for ventilating sloping roofs, characterized in that they are composed of three different types of strips (6a, 6b, 6c) joined together behind by a set of supporting brackets (7) which make it possible to form a set of slots (10, 11, 12) through which the atmospheric air can freely rise.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/17 (2006.01); F24F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/174 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1840295 A2 20071003; EP 1840295 A3 20120912

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130313

2013-07-04 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20130515

2013-05-15 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2013-05-15 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2012-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2012-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04D 13/17 20060101AFI20120808BHEP

2012-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24F 7/02 20060101ALI20120808BHEP

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU