Global Patent Index - EP 1840300 A2

EP 1840300 A2 2007-10-03 - Door Lock

Title (en)

Door Lock

Title (de)

Türschloss

Title (fr)

Verrou de porte

Publication

EP 1840300 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07104549 A

Priority

GB 0606261 A

Abstract (en)

A cylinder door lock assembly comprising a cylinder door lock (2,102) and a securing device (20,120,220), the cylinder door lock (2,102) having a body (4) in which is located a locking cam member (10), an opening (18), and at least one locking aperture (16); the securing device (20,120,220) being adapted to be received in the at least one locking aperture (16) and to extend out of the body (4) of the cylinder door lock (2,102), wherein the securing device (20,120,220) is operable to secure at least a portion of the cylinder door lock (2,102) in a locked position in a part of a door when the body (4) of the cylinder door lock (2,102) is broken.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/0062 (2013.01); E05B 9/048 (2013.01); E05B 9/084 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1840300 A2 20071003; EP 1840300 A3 20080528; GB 0606261 D0 20060510; GB 2436588 A 20071003

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081129

2009-03-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-02-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2008-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU