Global Patent Index - EP 1840302 A2

EP 1840302 A2 2007-10-03 - Door lock

Title (en)

Door lock

Title (de)

Türschloss

Title (fr)

Serrure de porte

Publication

EP 1840302 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07103777 A

Priority

FI 20065199 A

Abstract (en)

A door lock comprising a lock casing (1) with a first operating axis (3) arranged for handle actuation and a first follower arrangement (4) mounted thereon, a second operating axis (5) arranged for key and/or turning knob actuation and a second follower arrangement (6) mounted thereon, a latch bolt (7) spring-loaded to a position protruding from the lock casing, which latch bolt has two protrusion positions of different lengths, and an auxiliary bolt (8) for controlling the protrusion of the latch bolt (7). The lock casing (1) is also provided with a hook bolt (13), which may be positively urged to a protruding position and to a retracted position, and with activating means (16), which are selectively arranged so as to be moved from a first position, in which they prevent the protrusion of the hook bolt (13) to a second position, in which they allow the protrusion of the hook bolt (13).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/20 (2006.01); E05B 59/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 59/00 (2013.01); E05B 55/06 (2013.01); E05B 63/0013 (2013.01); E05B 63/0065 (2013.01); E05B 63/202 (2013.01); E05B 63/127 (2013.01); E05C 5/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1840302 A2 20071003; EP 1840302 A3 20090401; EP 1840302 B1 20110921; AT 525544 T 20111015; FI 121344 B 20101015; FI 20065199 A0 20060328; FI 20065199 A 20070929

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP EE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Payment date: 20170302

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170313

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121002

2014-07-31 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070308

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120308

2014-04-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110921

2013-07-31 [PG25 MT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110921

2013-06-28 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111221

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120101

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120308

2013-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120308

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602007017313

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120308

2012-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2012-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-10-18 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007017313

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110921

2012-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120123

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110921

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110921

2012-05-31 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110921

2012-05-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110921

2012-04-30 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110921

2012-04-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110921

2012-04-30 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120121

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110921

2012-03-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 525544 T

- Effective date: 20110921

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110921

2012-02-29 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110921

2012-02-29 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110921

2012-02-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110921

2012-02-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-02-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20110921

2012-02-15 [REG EE FG4A] TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA

- Document: EE E006188

- Effective date: 20111128

2012-01-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110921

2012-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110921

2012-01-18 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20110921

2012-01-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2011-12-01 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007017313

- Effective date: 20111201

2011-10-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2011-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-09-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-09-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-12-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090925

2009-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU