Global Patent Index - EP 1840305 A1

EP 1840305 A1 2007-10-03 - Medication keycode lock

Title (en)

Medication keycode lock

Title (de)

Schlüsselcodeverschluss für Medikation

Title (fr)

Serrure à code de clé pour medication

Publication

EP 1840305 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06006916 A

Priority

EP 06006916 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a medication keycode lock fan light fabricated from a sealing cap (30), a keycode cover (40) and a keycode cover opener (50). The sealing cap seals tight an opening of a medicine bottle (10), and a screw opening is formed in the sealing cap corresponding to position of an elastic septum (11) of the medicine bottle. The keycode cover screws into the screw opening of the sealing cover, and is used to cover the elastic septum of the medicine bottle. Furthermore, a keycode hole (41) having a set profile is defined in a surface of the keycode cover, and an end of the keycode cover opener is configured with a key that matches the keycode hole. The key of the keycode cover opener and the keycode hole must be in exact corresponding juxtaposition to enable unscrewing of the keycode cover, thereby uncovering the elastic septum of the medicine bottle and effectively resolving the problem of using the wrong medication due to inadvertence of the person concerned.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 73/00 (2006.01); B65D 55/14 (2006.01); E05B 35/00 (2006.01); E05B 35/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 55/14 (2013.01); B65D 51/002 (2013.01); E05B 73/00 (2013.01); E05B 73/0041 (2013.01); E05B 35/008 (2013.01); E05B 35/083 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1840305 A1 20071003

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090324

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080221

2008-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080122

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU