Global Patent Index - EP 1840454 A1

EP 1840454 A1 2007-10-03 - Removable lamp structure

Title (en)

Removable lamp structure

Title (de)

Abnehmbare Lampenstruktur

Title (fr)

Structure luminaire amovible

Publication

EP 1840454 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06122814 A

Priority

IT PS20060006 U

Abstract (en)

Removable lamp structure, especially for kitchen cabinets, comprising a pair of magnets (12, 13) to hold the lamp (8) attached to two parallel metal strips (3, 4) fixed on a surface (1), said metal strips also acting as contacts for low-voltage electric current pickup.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/096 (2006.01); F21V 23/06 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21W 131/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/096 (2013.01); F21V 21/35 (2013.01); F21V 23/023 (2013.01); F21V 19/0085 (2013.01); F21W 2131/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1840454 A1 20071003; IT PS20060006 U1 20071001

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100504

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080507

2008-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080329

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU