Global Patent Index - EP 1840458 A2

EP 1840458 A2 2007-10-03 - Gas burner

Title (en)

Gas burner

Title (de)

Gasbrenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur à gaz

Publication

EP 1840458 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07004535 A

Priority

DE 102006014082 A

Abstract (en)

The burner has a housing, and a combustion air blower (3) for delivering the combustion air. A mixing chamber (5) is provided for mixing the combustion air and gas. A burner surface (6) is provided for inflow of ignitable gas-air-mixture into the combustion chamber. An additional secondary air blower (7) delivers the secondary air and guides the secondary air into the combustion chamber through a secondary air inlet (8). The secondary air inlet has multiple secondary air openings, which are arranged in an edge area between the combustion surface and combustion chamber walls.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Gasbrenner, insbesondere Vormischbrenner, zur Verwendung in Brennkammern (1) von Heizgeräten mit einem Brennergehäuse (2), einem Verbrennungsluftgebläse (3) zur Förderung der Verbrennungsluft, einer Gaszuführung (4) mit Gasregelventil, einem Mischraum (5) zum Mischen von Verbrennungsluft und Gas, einer Brenneroberfläche (6) für den Eintritt des zündfähigen Gas-Luft-Gemischs in die Brennkammer sowie einer Sekundärluftzuführung. Der Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zugrunde, einen Brenner mit erhöhter Leistungsmodulation zu schaffen, der auch bei verschiedenen Betriebsbedingungen ohne die Nachteile der thermoakustischen Instabilität, der Kondensation sowie der Spannungsrissbildung auskommt. Der konstruktive Aufbau des Gasbrenners ist gekennzeichnet durch ein Sekundärluftgebläse (7), das Sekundärluft fördert und über einen Sekundärlufteintritt (8) in die Brennkammer (1) einleitet.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/02 (2006.01); F23D 14/64 (2006.01); F23L 9/00 (2006.01); F23N 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/64 (2013.01); F23C 7/02 (2013.01); F23L 9/00 (2013.01); F23N 5/242 (2013.01); F23D 2208/00 (2013.01); F23N 2025/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1840458 A2 20071003; EP 1840458 A3 20151104; EP 1840458 B1 20170823; DE 102006014082 A1 20071018; DE 102006014082 B4 20081002

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-08-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-04-12 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170313

2016-07-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2016-07-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: HR

2016-07-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: RS

2016-07-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: BA

2016-07-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: AL

2016-07-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: MK

2016-06-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160504

2016-06-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2015-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2015-11-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2015-11-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23C 7/02 20060101AFI20150929BHEP

2015-11-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23D 14/64 20060101ALI20150929BHEP

2015-11-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23L 9/00 20060101ALI20150929BHEP

2015-11-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23N 5/24 20060101ALI20150929BHEP

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU