Global Patent Index - EP 1840460 A1

EP 1840460 A1 2007-10-03 - Gas burner

Title (en)

Gas burner

Title (de)

Gasbrenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur à gaz

Publication

EP 1840460 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06251695 A

Priority

EP 06251695 A

Abstract (en)

A gas burner (30) includes an outer cylindrical wall (16) defining an internal cavity (20) for receiving a gas and air mixture and the outer cylindrical wall (16) includes a plurality of apertures (26) to allow a gas and air mixture to pass from the internal cavity (20) to an outer surface (16a) of the outer cylindrical wall (16) for combustion. A securing member (32) is attached to one end (33) of the outer cylindrical wall (16) and includes a circumferential inner rim (36) defining a circular opening (38). An inner cylindrical wall (18) is located inside the internal cavity (20) and defines at one end (50) thereof a circular flange (48), the circular flange (48) extending axially through the circular opening (38) and in a radially outwards direction to thereby secure the inner cylindrical wall (18) to the securing member (32). At least part of the circumferential inner rim (36) of the securing member (32) extends in a radially outwards direction and includes a slot (40).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/02 (2013.01); F23D 14/70 (2013.01); F23D 2203/1012 (2013.01); F23D 2900/00003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1840460 A1 20071003

INPADOC legal status


2015-06-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20141218

2014-09-03 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140807

2014-09-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WHITAKER, ALLAN

2010-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WORGAS BURNERS LIMITED

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071002

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU