Global Patent Index - EP 1840855 A1

EP 1840855 A1 2007-10-03 - Object detection system and method

Title (en)

Object detection system and method

Title (de)

Objekterkennungssystem und Verfahren

Title (fr)

Système et procédé de détection d'objet

Publication

EP 1840855 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06006335 A

Priority

EP 06006335 A

Abstract (en)

An object detection system and method is applied to an active surveillance system for detecting at least one target object appeared in an area of interest. The object detection system includes a processor for defining the area of interest into at least a first and a second zone; a controller for assigning a first and a second weight to the first and the second zone, respectively, wherein the first weight is higher than the second weight; and a first image capturing device for capturing an image of the target object appeared in the first zone prior to capturing an image of the target object appeared in the second zone. With these arrangements, the detection of at least one target object appeared in more than one zone having a specific weight assigned thereto may be implemented with improved efficiency and accuracy in object selection and reduced interferences from environmental variables.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/196 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/196 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1840855 A1 20071003

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090408

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071213

2007-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071029

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU