Global Patent Index - EP 1840920 A2

EP 1840920 A2 2007-10-03 - Cover for a safety circuit breaker and safety circuit breaker

Title (en)

Cover for a safety circuit breaker and safety circuit breaker

Title (de)

Deckel für einen Sicherungslasttrennschalter und Sicherungslasttrennschalter

Title (fr)

Couvercle pour un disjoncteur-sectionneur et disjoncteur-sectionneur

Publication

EP 1840920 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07103764 A

Priority

DE 102006015303 A

Abstract (en)

The cover (10) has a blocking unit (34) provided at a support bar (18), where the unit is movable from a resting position to an operating position. The rotation of an indicator device (22) with a lever arm is blocked/not blocked in the respective resting and operating positions. The blocking unit is provided in the resting position when a locking device is not held in the bar. The blocking unit is provided in the operating position when the device is held in the bar.

Abstract (de)

In einem Deckel (10) für einen Sicherungslasttrennschalter ist ein Anzeigesystem (20) angeordnet, das in einer ersten Anzeigeeinstellung eine Anzeige "AUS" anzeigt. Die Anzeigeeinrichtung (22) ist drehbar, dies aber nur dann, wenn ein Blockierelement (34) sich in einer Arbeitsstellung befindet. Die Arbeitsstellung nimmt das Blockierelement (34) dann ein, wenn eine Sicherung in eine Sicherungshalterung im erfindungsgemäßen Deckel eingebracht ist. Bei einem Schließen des Deckels wirkt ein Gegenelement auf einen von der Anzeigeeinrichtung (22) wegstehenden Hebelarm (30) und leitet eine Drehung der Anzeigeeinrichtung (22) dergestalt ein, dass nunmehr die Anzeige 28 "EIN" angezeigt wird. Um zu bewirken, dass von einer Anzeige "AUS" auf eine Anzeige "EIN" gewechselt wird, muss also sowohl eine Sicherung in der Sicherungshalterung (18) gehalten sein, als auch der Deckel (10) geschlossen sein.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 31/12 (2006.01); H01H 9/16 (2006.01); H01H 85/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 31/122 (2013.01); H01H 9/104 (2013.01); H01H 9/16 (2013.01); H01H 85/30 (2013.01); H01H 85/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1840920 A2 20071003; EP 1840920 A3 20090708; DE 102006015303 A1 20071011

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-07-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU