Global Patent Index - EP 1841106 A2

EP 1841106 A2 2007-10-03 - DAB-compatible transmitting and receiving method and system for terrestrial mobile multimedia broadcasting

Title (en)

DAB-compatible transmitting and receiving method and system for terrestrial mobile multimedia broadcasting

Title (de)

DAB-kompatibles Verfahren und System zum Senden und Empfangen für terrestrischen mobilen Multimediarundfunk

Title (fr)

Procédé et système de transmission et de réception compatible DAB pour diffusion multimédia mobile terrestre

Publication

EP 1841106 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07104721 A

Priority

  • CN 200610066230 A
  • CN 200610160929 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention discloses a DAB-compatible transmitting method for terrestrial mobile multimedia broadcasting in which service type of multimedia broadcasting is predefined to be including terrestrial mobile multimedia broadcasting (T-MMB) service, the method comprises the steps of receiving multimedia broadcasting service data and performing sequentially source coding and channel coding on said service data according to their service type; embedding the encoded data into the main service channel (MSC) of the system in a time division multiplex mode, identifying accordingly information on subchannel, etc. corresponding to the service data in the fast information channel (FIC) of the system, and performing channel coding on the data in FIC; performing channel modulation, OFDM modulation and radio frequency (RF) modulation on the channel-modulated data of FIC, MSC according to the transmission mode and the channel modulation scheme, and then sending them out. With the invention, it is possible to effectively transmit multiple types of multimedia broadcasting service data in a mobile environment. The invention also discloses a DAB-compatible system and reception method for terrestrial mobile multimedia broadcasting.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/72 (2008.01); H04H 20/46 (2008.01); H04H 20/57 (2008.01); H04H 20/86 (2008.01); H04H 40/27 (2008.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

H04H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/46 (2013.01); H04H 20/72 (2013.01); H04H 20/57 (2013.01); H04H 20/86 (2013.01); H04H 40/27 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1841106 A2 20071003; EP 1841106 A3 20111102; CN 101022440 A 20070822; CN 101022440 B 20101208

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-08-30 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20120711

2012-07-11 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2012-07-11 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2011-11-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04H 20/72 20080101AFI20110930BHEP

2011-11-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04H 20/46 20080101ALI20110930BHEP

2011-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2008-08-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BEIJING NUFRONT MOBILE MULTIMEDIA TECHNOLOGY CO.,

2008-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAO, DONGSHAN

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU