Global Patent Index - EP 1841293 A1

EP 1841293 A1 2007-10-03 - System and method for extension of the life time of fluorescent lamps

Title (en)

System and method for extension of the life time of fluorescent lamps

Title (de)

System und Verfahren zum Verlängern der Lebensdauer von Leuchtstoffröhren

Title (fr)

Système et procédé pour la prolongation de la durée de fonctionnement des lampes fluorescentes

Publication

EP 1841293 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06111817 A

Priority

EP 06111817 A

Abstract (en)

The system has a primary end cap (1') and a secondary end cap (2') with connections (1a',1b',2a',2b'). An electronic control gear (8) has an alternating current from the alternating current source (11). The two connections of the secondary end cap lie together in a common electrical potential. A primary lamp holder (6) and a secondary lamp holder (12) has electric receiver and mechanical positioning, where the primary holder electrically and mechanically receives the two connections of the primary end cap and connects to the high frequency outputs (8c,8d) of the electronic control gears. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) a method for the operation of a primary and a secondary end cap with two connections, which have fluorescent tube (2) an adapter element for operation of a primary and a secondary end cap with two connections, which have fluorescent tube.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein System, ein Verfahren und ein Adapterelement zum Betreiben einer eine erste und eine zweite Endkappe 1', 2' mit jeweils zwei Anschlüssen 1a', 1b', 2a', 2b' aufweisenden Leuchtstoffröhre, wobei die zwei Anschlüsse 1a', 1b' der ersten Endkappe 1' mit einem hochfrequenten Ausgang 8c, 8d, 8c', 8d' eines mit einem Wechselstrom von einer wechselstromquelle 11 gespeisten elektronischen Vorschaltgeräts 8, 8' verbunden sind, und wobei die zwei Anschlüsse 2a', 2b' der zweiten Endkappe 2' zusammen auf einem gemeinsamen elektrischen Potential liegen.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/295 (2006.01); H01R 33/945 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/295 (2013.01); H01R 33/0827 (2013.01); H01R 33/945 (2013.01); H05B 41/282 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 1095541 B1 20020717 - FUTURE NEW DEVELOPMENTS LTD [KY]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1841293 A1 20071003

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100518

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080404

2008-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080307

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU