Global Patent Index - EP 1841373 A2

EP 1841373 A2 2007-10-10 - RELOCATABLE STEREOTACTIC IMMOBILIZATION APPARATUS

Title (en)

RELOCATABLE STEREOTACTIC IMMOBILIZATION APPARATUS

Title (de)

VERSCHIEBBARE STEREOTAKTISCHE IMMOBILISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL D'IMMOBILISATION STEREOTACTIQUE REPOSITIONNABLE

Publication

EP 1841373 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06719668 A

Priority

  • US 2006002912 W
  • US 64789305 P
  • US 64792005 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006081412A2] A patient immobilization frame is provided that can be secured to a patient table in a radiation therapy facility. The frame includes fiducials integrated into the bottom panel of the frame. The frame is provided with a removable locking mechanism for locking the frame to the patient table. Each side walls of the frame defines a forward cut-out and a mid-side cut-out to accommodate larger girth patients. A panel insert is provided to close the mid-side cut-outs when the additional space is not required for the patient. The frame further includes an abdomen compression device supported by a cross bar that is movably mountable to the frame. The device includes a compression plate configured to contact the patient and a compression mechanism between the cross bar and the compression plate. A pressure transducer may be incorporated between the compression plate and the cross bar.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 15/00 (2006.01); A47C 21/08 (2006.01); A61B 5/055 (2006.01); A61B 6/04 (2006.01); A61G 7/05 (2006.01); G01R 33/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61N 5/1049 (2013.01); A61B 6/0421 (2013.01); A61B 2090/101 (2016.02); A61N 2005/1097 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006081412 A2 20060803; WO 2006081412 A3 20090409; AU 2006208063 A1 20060803; EP 1841373 A2 20071010; EP 1841373 A4 20110323

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110927

2011-03-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20110223

2011-03-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61G 15/00 20060101AFI20090506BHEP

2011-03-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47C 21/08 20060101ALI20110217BHEP

2011-03-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61B 5/055 20060101ALI20110217BHEP

2011-03-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61B 6/04 20060101ALI20110217BHEP

2011-03-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61G 7/05 20060101ALI20110217BHEP

2011-03-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01R 33/28 20060101ALI20110217BHEP

2009-06-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61G 15/00 20060101AFI20090506BHEP

2009-05-13 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20090409

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070720

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU