Global Patent Index - EP 1841406 A2

EP 1841406 A2 2007-10-10 - METHODS AND FORMULATIONS

Title (en)

METHODS AND FORMULATIONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND FORMULIERUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET FORMULATIONS

Publication

EP 1841406 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 05854851 A

Priority

  • US 2005046204 W
  • US 63782404 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006069079A2] The present invention describes methods and formulations using vitronectin receptor antagonists for the prevention of excessive scarring.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 65/00 (2006.01); A01N 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/4906 (2013.01); A61K 9/0014 (2013.01); A61K 31/55 (2013.01); A61Q 19/00 (2013.01); A61K 47/10 (2013.01); A61K 47/14 (2013.01); A61K 47/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

HR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006069079 A2 20060629; WO 2006069079 A3 20070419; AR 052823 A1 20070404; EP 1841406 A2 20071010; EP 1841406 A4 20080625; JP 2008524334 A 20080710; PE 08702006 A1 20060816; TW 200635902 A 20061016

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081202

2008-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080721

2008-06-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20080526

2008-03-26 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20070718

- Countries: HR

2007-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A01N 65/00 20060101AFI20071108BHEP

2007-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A01N 25/00 20060101ALI20071108BHEP

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070718

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU