Global Patent Index - EP 1841424 A2

EP 1841424 A2 2007-10-10 - SYNTHESIS OF ARYL PYRROLIDONES

Title (en)

SYNTHESIS OF ARYL PYRROLIDONES

Title (de)

ARYLPYRROLIDONSYNTHESE

Title (fr)

SYNTHESE D'ARYL PYRROLIDONES

Publication

EP 1841424 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06719887 A

Priority

  • US 2006003240 W
  • US 64803905 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006081562A2] The invention provides methods of asymmetrically synthesizing aryl pyrrolidones with high yield and high enantionmeric excess.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 207/27 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 207/27 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006081562 A2 20060803; WO 2006081562 A3 20061019; AU 2006209241 A1 20060803; AU 2006209241 B2 20091022; BR PI0607294 A2 20090825; CA 2593816 A1 20060803; CN 101111246 A 20080123; EP 1841424 A2 20071010; EP 1841424 A4 20100127; JP 2008528625 A 20080731; KR 100890696 B1 20090326; KR 20070097555 A 20071004; MX 2007008974 A 20070918; RU 2007132260 A 20090310

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-22 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1108386

2010-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-01-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100104

2010-01-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07D 207/27 20060101AFI20091217BHEP

2008-05-09 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1108386

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070727

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR