Global Patent Index - EP 1841513 A2

EP 1841513 A2 2007-10-10 - GAME PLAYING METHODS AND APPARATUS

Title (en)

GAME PLAYING METHODS AND APPARATUS

Title (de)

SPIELVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET APPAREIL DE JEU

Publication

EP 1841513 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06700804 A

Priority

  • GB 2006050009 W
  • GB 0500950 A
  • GB 0501256 A
  • GB 0502034 A
  • GB 0514672 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006075194A2] A game-playing apparatus comprising a device (10) for playing an optical data- storage disc, an optical data-storage disc (16) authored to provide an interactive 5 game and at least two handsets (18, 20) for remotely controlling the operation of the playing device (10) to play the game.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/95 (2014.09); A63F 13/10 (2013.01); A63F 13/48 (2014.09); A63F 13/71 (2014.09); A63F 2300/206 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006075194A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006075194 A2 20060720; WO 2006075194 A3 20060928; AU 2006205680 A1 20060720; EP 1841513 A2 20071010; GB 0600918 D0 20060222; GB 0622625 D0 20061220; GB 0622663 D0 20061220; GB 2422466 A 20060726; GB 2422466 B 20070314; GB 2429561 A 20070228; GB 2429817 A 20070307; GB 2429817 B 20070822; GB 2429817 C 20070914

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120801

2009-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080808

2008-04-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-03-19 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 0101 MULTI-MOTE LIMITED

- Effective date: 20080204

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070814

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR