Global Patent Index - EP 1841629 A2

EP 1841629 A2 2007-10-10 - LOGIC FOR AN AUTOMOTIVE AIR BAG SYSTEM

Title (en)

LOGIC FOR AN AUTOMOTIVE AIR BAG SYSTEM

Title (de)

LOGIK FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG-AIRBAGSYSTEM

Title (fr)

LOGIQUE POUR SYSTEME DE COUSSIN DE SECURITE GONFLABLE POUR AUTOMOBILES

Publication

EP 1841629 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06733824 A

Priority

  • US 2006002375 W
  • US 64592105 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006081218A2] The present invention relates to a logic for an air bag system for protecting the vehicles, obstacle(s), passenger(s), and pedestrian(s) from a collision by using an external detection system, detectable coating material, wireless system, internal detection system, computer processing unit, at least one external air bag inflation device and at least one internal air bag inflation device. Particularly for an effective use of this system, the present invention describes a method for distinguishing objects, a method for applying a minimum allowable time window to a CPU process, a method for calculating information as to the portion of a roadway obstacle located within a blind zone, a method for using clampers to control inflation size of an external air bag installed on a roadway vehicle, a method for an inflated external air bag installed on an obstacle, and a method for increasing an effectiveness of the absorption capability and capacity of an inflated air bag.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 22/00 (2006.01); B60Q 1/00 (2006.01); B60R 21/013 (2006.01); B60R 21/16 (2006.01); G01S 13/58 (2006.01); G05D 1/00 (2006.01); G05D 3/00 (2006.01); G06F 7/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/00 (2006.01); B60R 21/2338 (2011.01); B60R 21/26 (2011.01); B60R 21/263 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/0134 (2013.01); B60R 19/205 (2013.01); E01F 15/148 (2013.01); B60R 21/013 (2013.01); B60R 21/276 (2013.01); B60R 2021/0009 (2013.01); B60R 2021/01225 (2013.01); B60R 2021/23388 (2013.01); B60R 2021/2633 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006081218 A2 20060803; WO 2006081218 A3 20080925; WO 2006081218 A8 20070322; EP 1841629 A2 20071010; EP 1841629 A4 20091230; JP 2008532825 A 20080821; KR 100952592 B1 20100415; KR 20070105346 A 20071030

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101023

2010-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100412

2010-01-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60R 22/00 20060101AFI20081119BHEP

2010-01-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60R 21/16 20060101ALI20091126BHEP

2010-01-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G05D 3/00 20060101ALI20091126BHEP

2010-01-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G05D 1/00 20060101ALI20091126BHEP

2010-01-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 7/00 20060101ALI20091126BHEP

2010-01-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 17/00 20060101ALI20091126BHEP

2010-01-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01S 13/58 20060101ALI20091126BHEP

2010-01-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60Q 1/00 20060101ALI20091126BHEP

2010-01-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60R 21/013 20060101ALI20091126BHEP

2009-12-30 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20091202

2008-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60R 21/16 20060101ALI20081119BHEP

2008-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G05D 3/00 20060101ALI20081119BHEP

2008-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G05D 1/00 20060101ALI20081119BHEP

2008-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 7/00 20060101ALI20081119BHEP

2008-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 17/00 20060101ALI20081119BHEP

2008-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01S 13/58 20060101ALI20081119BHEP

2008-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60Q 1/00 20060101ALI20081119BHEP

2008-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60R 22/00 20060101AFI20081119BHEP

2008-11-05 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20080925

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070719

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU