Global Patent Index - EP 1841663 A1

EP 1841663 A1 2007-10-10 - NOVEL BIOACTIVE PACKAGES AND THE CLOSURES THEREOF

Title (en)

NOVEL BIOACTIVE PACKAGES AND THE CLOSURES THEREOF

Title (de)

NEUE BIOAKTIVE VERPACKUNGEN UND VERSCHLÜSSE DAFÜR

Title (fr)

EMBALLAGES ET FERMETURES D'EMBALLAGES ACTIFS

Publication

EP 1841663 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 06709148 A

Priority

  • FR 2006000146 W
  • FR 0500803 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2881115A1] The assembly has a head (1) extended by a main body (3) including an inner space (4) provided with a container (5) that rests on an o-ring seal. The seal is structured as annular layers including transversal channels (7) allowing passage of solutions contained in the container towards the space. The head is provided with an inner thread (2) permitting screwing on neck of a receptacle (8).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/30 (2006.01); B65D 51/24 (2006.01); B65D 51/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/24 (2013.01); B65D 51/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006079708A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2881115 A1 20060728; FR 2881115 B1 20081031; AU 2006208823 A1 20060803; AU 2006208823 B2 20120119; CA 2595963 A1 20060803; EP 1841663 A1 20071010; US 2008169217 A1 20080717; WO 2006079708 A1 20060803

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150811

2010-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100604

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070808

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR