Global Patent Index - EP 1841682 A1

EP 1841682 A1 2007-10-10 - ELEVATOR CAR DOOR LOCKING APPARATUS

Title (en)

ELEVATOR CAR DOOR LOCKING APPARATUS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERRIEGELUNG VON AUFZUGSKABINEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE VERROUILLAGE DE PROTE DE CABINE D'ASCENSEUR

Publication

EP 1841682 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 05704398 A

Priority

JP 2005001638 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006080094A1] This invention provides a mechanical car door locking apparatus which is automatically operated by a door drive but independent of a door drive coupling mechanism. According to this invention, when, with a car positioned outside a landing zone, the motion of a first cam moving along with door opening motion is transferred to a first roller, a slider moves along a slider rod in the direction of door opening in conjunction with the motion of the first cam, whereby a static latch moving along with the door opening motion engages with a latch to disable door opening operation.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006080094 A1 20060803; CN 101031497 A 20070905; CN 101031497 B 20101013; EP 1841682 A1 20071010; EP 1841682 A4 20120502; EP 1841682 B1 20140319; JP 2008528399 A 20080731; JP 4292207 B2 20090708

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161212

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-05-17 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 602005043005

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-04-02 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602005043005

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20141222

2014-12-22 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602005043005

2014-05-28 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2014-04-30 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602005043005

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

2013-11-13 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20131018

2012-05-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 13/18 20060101AFI20120326BHEP

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-05-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061116

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL