Global Patent Index - EP 1841697 A1

EP 1841697 A1 2007-10-10 - WATER SOFTENING DEVICE AND METHOD

Title (en)

WATER SOFTENING DEVICE AND METHOD

Title (de)

WASSERENTHÄRTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'ADOUCISSEMENT D'EAU

Publication

EP 1841697 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 05820658 A

Priority

  • EP 2005014060 W
  • EP 05075218 A
  • EP 05820658 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006079417A1] The present invention provides a water softening device for application in a household appliance comprising a flow-through capacitor for the production of wash amplified water (WAW) from tap water, having less than 5° FH, being suitable for use in said appliance when the device is in operation; the configuration of the device is such that the capacitor can be regenerated, whereby no added substances are used. Said washing machine being suitable for use with low environmental impact detergent products.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/469 (2006.01); A47L 15/42 (2006.01); B01D 61/46 (2006.01); B01J 47/08 (2006.01); C02F 1/461 (2006.01); D06F 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/4691 (2013.01); A47L 15/4229 (2013.01); C02F 1/4618 (2013.01); D06F 39/007 (2013.01); C02F 2301/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006079417A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006079417 A1 20060803; AU 2005325830 A1 20060803; AU 2005325830 B2 20090910; BR PI0519941 A2 20090804; CA 2601353 A1 20060803; CN 101107200 A 20080116; EP 1841697 A1 20071010; MX 2007008976 A 20070918; US 2009114598 A1 20090507; ZA 200705509 B 20081231

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-19 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20130115

2013-01-15 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2011-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20101222

2010-05-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOLTEA LIMITED

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070614

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR