Global Patent Index - EP 1841698 A2

EP 1841698 A2 2007-10-10 - OZONE INJECTION METHOD AND SYSTEM

Title (en)

OZONE INJECTION METHOD AND SYSTEM

Title (de)

OZONINJEKTIONSVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'INJECTION D'OZONE

Publication

EP 1841698 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 05857110 A

Priority

  • US 2005045738 W
  • US 3981905 A
  • US 22635805 A
  • US 22635905 A
  • US 23057105 A
  • US 24623505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006086073A2] A method and system of ozone treatment diverts a portion of water from a flow of water in a conduit; injects an ozone-containing gas into the portion to provide an ozonated portion; recombines the ozonated portion with the flow of water in the conduit; and preferably controls and/or regulates the diverted portion to provide a minimum diverted portion flow rate according to flow in the conduit and proportion of ozone in the injected gas. Another method and system identifies a species-destructive reaction product of ozone with a water constituent, determines a life of the reaction product, and contacts ozone with a water containing the species for a period determined according to the determined life of the reaction product. Another method and system treat ballast-water with ozone without release of detrimental off-gas into the atmosphere.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 13/00 (2013.01); C02F 1/78 (2013.01); B63J 4/002 (2013.01); C02F 2103/008 (2013.01); C02F 2201/782 (2013.01); C02F 2209/005 (2013.01); C02F 2301/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006086073A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006086073 A2 20060817; WO 2006086073 A3 20061026; AU 2005320350 A1 20060824; AU 2005320350 A8 20090122; AU 2005320350 B2 20090129; AU 2005320350 B8 20091119; CA 2595734 A1 20060817; CA 2595734 C 20100216; CN 104355391 A 20150218; CN 104355391 B 20170711; CN 1938231 A 20070328; CN 1938231 B 20150930; EP 1841698 A2 20071010; EP 2899165 A2 20150729; EP 2899165 A3 20150812; HK 1204785 A1 20151204; JP 2007527798 A 20071004; JP 4964120 B2 20120627; KR 100889190 B1 20090317; KR 20070102626 A 20071018; NO 20074333 A 20071019

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-08 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1108424

2015-05-06 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20141211

2014-12-11 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2011-11-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20111012

2008-05-09 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1108424

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070720

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR