Global Patent Index - EP 1841719 A1

EP 1841719 A1 2007-10-10 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING BUTADIENE FROM N-BUTANE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING BUTADIENE FROM N-BUTANE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BUTADIEN AUS N-BUTAN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DU BUTADIENE A PARTIR DE N-BUTANE

Publication

EP 1841719 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06707724 A

Priority

  • EP 2006050217 W
  • DE 102005002127 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006075025A1] The invention relates to a method for producing butadiene from n-butane comprising the following steps: A) provision of a feed gas stream (a) containing n-butane; B) introduction of the feed gas stream (a) containing n-butane into at least one first dehydrogenation zone and the non-oxidative catalytic dehydrogenation of n-butane to obtain a product gas stream (b) containing n-butane, 1-butene, 2-butene, butadiene, hydrogen, low-boiling minor constituents, optionally carbon oxides and optionally water vapour; C) introduction of the product gas stream (b) of the non-oxidative catalytic dehydrogenation and a gas containing oxygen into at least a second dehydrogenation zone and the oxidative dehydrogenation of n-butane, 1-butene and 2-butene to obtain a product gas stream (c) containing n-butane, 2-butene, butadiene, low-boiling minor constituents, carbon oxides and water vapour, said stream having a higher butadiene content than the product gas (b); D) isolation of the low-boiling minor constituents and the water vapour to obtain a C<SUB>4</SUB> product gas stream (d), which essentially consists of n-butane, 2-butene and butadiene; E) separation of the C<SUB>4</SUB> product gas stream (d) into a stream (e1), which essentially consists of n-butane and 2-butene and a useful product stream (e2), which essentially consists of butadiene, by extractive distillation; F) return of the stream (e1) to the first dehydrogenation zone.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 7/08 (2006.01); C07C 5/333 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 5/3337 (2013.01); C07C 7/08 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C07C 5/3337 + C07C 11/167
  2. C07C 7/08 + C07C 11/167

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006075025A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005002127 A1 20060720; BR PI0606630 A2 20100119; CN 101119949 A 20080206; CN 101119949 B 20100526; EA 012614 B1 20091030; EA 200701506 A1 20080228; EP 1841719 A1 20071010; KR 101270890 B1 20130607; KR 20070095335 A 20070928; MY 151171 A 20140430; TW 200630333 A 20060901; US 2008183024 A1 20080731; US 8088962 B2 20120103; WO 2006075025 A1 20060720

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DUDA, MARK

2016-01-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BORGMEIER, FRIEDER

2016-01-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SIMON, FALK

2016-01-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLANNER, CATHARINA

2016-01-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CRONE, SVEN

2016-01-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHINDLER, GOETZ-PETER

2016-01-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150703

2015-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CRONE, SVEN

2015-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BORGMEIER, FRIEDER

2015-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SIMON, FALK

2015-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DUDA, MARK

2015-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHINDLER, GOETZ-PETER

2015-03-18 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150220

2015-03-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07C 7/08 20060101AFI20150129BHEP

2015-03-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07C 5/333 20060101ALI20150129BHEP

2008-04-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASF SE

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070817

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR