Global Patent Index - EP 1841767 A1

EP 1841767 A1 2007-10-10 - PYRAZOLOPYRIDINES, THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR MEDICAL USE

Title (en)

PYRAZOLOPYRIDINES, THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR MEDICAL USE

Title (de)

PYRAZOLOPYRIDINE, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE MEDIZINISCHE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

PYRAZOLOPYRIDINES, LEUR PRÉPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION MÉDICALE

Publication

EP 1841767 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06701504 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000623 W
  • EP 05075177 A
  • EP 06701504 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1683796A1] The invention relates to pyrazolopyridines according to the general Formula I and the salts thereof, to pharmaceutical compositions comprising the pyrazolopyridines and to a method of preparing the pyrazolopyrimidines as well as the use thereof for manufacturing a pharmaceutical composition for the treatment of diseases of dysregulated vascular growth or of diseases which are accompanied with dysregulated vascular growth, wherein the compounds effectively interfere with angiopoietin and therefore influence Tie2 signalling.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 471/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/437 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 27/00 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07D 213/85 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 471/04 (2013.01); C07D 213/85 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006077168A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1683796 A1 20060726; AR 054725 A1 20070711; DO P2006000017 A 20060815; EP 1841767 A1 20071010; GT 200600025 A 20070103; JP 2008528458 A 20080731; JP 5203713 B2 20130605; PA 8660601 A1 20060803; PE 09572006 A1 20061013; TW 200637860 A 20061101; UY 29343 A1 20060831; WO 2006077168 A1 20060727

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151124

2012-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2011-08-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2011-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110203

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070329

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR