Global Patent Index - EP 1841820 A1

EP 1841820 A1 2007-10-10 - TYRE RUNNING THREAD

Title (en)

TYRE RUNNING THREAD

Title (de)

REIFENLAUFFLÄCHE

Title (fr)

BANDE DE ROULEMENT POUR PNEUMATIQUE

Publication

EP 1841820 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 06700002 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000306 W
  • FR 0500568 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CN101107307A] The inventive tyre running thread comprises a rubber composition based on at least one type of diene elastomer, a non-black reinforcement filler, in particular inorganic, a coupling agent for bonding said dien elastomer and the filler, wherein said composition is characterised in that it also comprises a pro-photo oxidant agent and optionally a carbon black at a rate of less than 5 pce (parts by weight per hundred parts of elastomer). Said pro-photo oxidant agent is mainly embodied in the form of a radical or cationic photoinitiator activated or not by the presence of a photo-sensitiser. Tyres provided with said photo oxide (exposed to UV-visible radiation) running thread exhibit a substentially increased adherence on a wet road.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08K 13/02 (2006.01); B60C 1/00 (2006.01); C08L 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08K 5/0033 (2013.01); B60C 1/0016 (2013.01); C08K 5/07 (2013.01); C08K 5/1545 (2013.01); C08K 5/46 (2013.01); C08K 5/5397 (2013.01); C08K 5/548 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08K 5/0033 + C08L 21/00
  2. C08K 5/07 + C08L 21/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006077059A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2880893 A1 20060721; FR 2880893 B1 20071026; BR PI0606610 A2 20100309; CN 101107307 A 20080116; CN 101107307 B 20110608; EP 1841820 A1 20071010; JP 2008527157 A 20080724; JP 5101299 B2 20121219; KR 20070100369 A 20071010; US 2008121324 A1 20080529; WO 2006077059 A1 20060727

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121205

2012-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MICHELIN RECHERCHE ET TECHNIQUE S.A.

2012-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN

2008-04-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CAMBON, STEPHANIE

2007-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VASSEUR, DIDIER

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070820

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR