Global Patent Index - EP 1841899 A1

EP 1841899 A1 2007-10-10 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING AN ALKALI METAL HYPOCHLORITE SOLUTION

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING AN ALKALI METAL HYPOCHLORITE SOLUTION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ALKALIMETALL-HYPOCHLORIT-LÖSUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PREPARER UNE SOLUTION D'HYPOCHLORURE DE METAL ALCALIN

Publication

EP 1841899 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06700215 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000060 W
  • DE 102005004063 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006077016A1] The invention relates to a device and a method for producing an alkali hypochlorite solution, especially a sodium hypochlorite solution. The inventive device comprises at least one electrolytic cell (12), means (20, 22, 24, 26) for feeding a brine solution having a defined volume flow rate and a defined salt concentration to the electrolytic cell (12), and a DC voltage source (18) for generating a current flowing through the electrolytic cell (12). The intensity of current is fixedly set in such a manner that the concentration of the chlorate produced during electrolysis is limited to a maximum of 1.5 g/l, preferably 0.6 g/l.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25B 1/26 (2006.01); C02F 1/467 (2006.01); C25B 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/4674 (2013.01); C25B 1/26 (2013.01); C25B 15/08 (2013.01); C02F 2001/46133 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006077016A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005004063 A1 20060727; EP 1841899 A1 20071010; US 2008017519 A1 20080124; WO 2006077016 A1 20060727

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20170206

2017-02-06 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2011-12-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20111108

2011-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KAERCHER FUTURETECH GMBH

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070621

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR