Global Patent Index - EP 1841907 A1

EP 1841907 A1 2007-10-10 - STAPLE YARN MANUFACTURING PROCESS

Title (en)

STAPLE YARN MANUFACTURING PROCESS

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR STAPELGARN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE FIL DE FIBRES COUPEES

Publication

EP 1841907 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06719130 A

Priority

  • US 2006002166 W
  • US 64569505 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2006165982A1] The present invention is a staple-fiber yarn, an apparatus for producing the yarn, and a process for stretch breaking filament yarns to produce the staple yarn. The process enables the production of a plurality of products of lot size smaller than a large denier tow product. The process includes a draw zone, a tension control zone, a stretch-break zone and a consolidation zone to form a yarn of staple fibers.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 1/08 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2913 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006078974A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

US 2006165982 A1 20060727; CN 101146938 A 20080319; EP 1841907 A1 20071010; JP 2008528818 A 20080731; KR 20070095429 A 20070928; US 2009183487 A1 20090723; WO 2006078974 A1 20060727

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081104

2008-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080623

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-03-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070806

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL