Global Patent Index - EP 1841930 A1

EP 1841930 A1 2007-10-10 - SUPPORT-TYPE COMPONENT THAT IS COMPOSED OF INDIVIDUAL SECTIONS AND METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING SAID COMPONENT

Title (en)

SUPPORT-TYPE COMPONENT THAT IS COMPOSED OF INDIVIDUAL SECTIONS AND METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING SAID COMPONENT

Title (de)

TR[GERARTIGES, AUS EINZELTEILEN ZUSAMMENGESETZTES BAUELEMENT SOWIE VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES BAUELEMENTS

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE TYPE SUPPORT COMPOSE DE PARTIES INDIVIDUELLES, ET PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE REALISER

Publication

EP 1841930 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06701492 A

Priority

  • AT 2006000034 W
  • AT 1302005 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006079134A1] The invention relates to a support-type component (1) that is composed of individual sections and comprises a flange (2) and two struts (3, 4). Said component is characterised in that the flange (2) is provided with a respective strut (3, 4) on each longitudinal side, each strut being fixed to a longitudinal side wall of the flange (2), preferably by means of adhesive and that the end regions (7) of the struts (3, 4) that face away from the flange (2) are joined together by their adjacent surfaces (8, 9), preferably by means of adhesive. The respective struts (3, 4) have a cross-section in the form of an elongated S.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/36 (2006.01); E04C 3/04 (2006.01); E04C 3/14 (2006.01); E04C 3/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 3/14 (2013.01); E04C 2/36 (2013.01); E04C 3/122 (2013.01); E04C 3/29 (2013.01); E04C 3/292 (2013.01); E04C 2003/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006079134A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006079134 A1 20060803; AT 486182 T 20101115; AT 501521 A1 20060915; AT 501521 B1 20130715; AU 2006209252 A1 20060803; AU 2006209252 B2 20110217; CA 2595932 A1 20060803; CA 2595932 C 20130528; DE 502006008178 D1 20101209; DK 1841930 T3 20110131; EP 1841930 A1 20071010; EP 1841930 B1 20101027; ES 2355050 T3 20110322; JP 2008528830 A 20080731; JP 4954900 B2 20120620; RU 2007132168 A 20090310; RU 2391468 C2 20100610; SI 1841930 T1 20110331; UA 88505 C2 20091026; US 2008148657 A1 20080626; US 7921621 B2 20110412

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180129

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20180115

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180110

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-05-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLEESTRASSE 87, 4054 BASEL (CH)

2018-04-30 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-01-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP LV] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Payment date: 20170111

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20170116

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20170117

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP BG] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-28 [PGFP LT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Payment date: 20170111

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-28 [PGFP EE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Payment date: 20170111

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101027

2013-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101027

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110124

2011-11-24 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502006008178

- Effective date: 20110728

2011-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110728

2011-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-08-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101027

2011-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110128

2011-05-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110227

2011-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-05-30 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E010142

2011-04-29 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2011-03-22 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110310

2011-02-09 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2011-02-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2011-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUNPAT BRAUN EDER AG

2011-01-31 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2011-01-21 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2010-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006008178 P 20101209

2010-11-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2010-10-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-10-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-12-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081202

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070718

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR