Global Patent Index - EP 1841937 A1

EP 1841937 A1 2007-10-10 - HINGE WITH INTEGRATED STAY MECHANISM

Title (en)

HINGE WITH INTEGRATED STAY MECHANISM

Title (de)

SCHARNIER MIT INTEGRIERTEM AUSSTELLERMECHANISMUS

Title (fr)

CHARNIERE COMPRENANT UN MECANISME D'ARRET INTEGRE

Publication

EP 1841937 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 05823888 A

Priority

  • EP 2005014116 W
  • DE 102005001706 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006074811A1] This invention relates to a hinge (1), particularly for the door of a motor vehicle, comprising a first hinge part (10, 110), a second hinge part (20, 120), a hinge shaft (30, 130, 131), which defines the pivot axis of the hinge (1), around which the first hinge part (10, 110) is pivotable with respect to the second hinge part (20, 120), and an integrated stay mechanism (40, 50, 140, 150) for a stepless locking of the first hinge part (10, 110) with respect to the second hinge part (20, 120) at an arbitrary fixing position, wherein the stay mechanism (40, 50, 140, 150) comprises a first fixing element (40, 140) which is selectively rotatably fixed at the first hinge part (10, 110) and selectively rotatable around the pivot axis by means of the second hinge part (20, 120), to set the stay position, and a second fixing element (50, 150) which is pivotable together with the second hinge part (20, 120) and latches with the first fixing element (40, 140) at the respective stay position.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/10 (2006.01); E05D 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/1071 (2013.01); E05D 11/084 (2013.01); E05D 2011/088 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/49 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006074811A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006074811 A1 20060720; DE 102005001706 A1 20060727; EP 1841937 A1 20071010

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090408

2008-12-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081127

2008-04-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-02-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070808

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES