Global Patent Index - EP 1842012 A2

EP 1842012 A2 2007-10-10 - RACK ASSEMBLY FOR MOUNTING SOLAR MODULES

Title (en)

RACK ASSEMBLY FOR MOUNTING SOLAR MODULES

Title (de)

TRÄGERANORDNUNG ZUR MONTAGE VON SOLARMODULEN

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE D'ETAGERES POUR LE MONTAGE DE MODULES SOLAIRES

Publication

EP 1842012 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06733720 A

Priority

  • US 2006001593 W
  • US 64361905 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006076719A2] A rack assembly is provided for mounting solar modules over an underlying body. The rack assembly may include a plurality of rail structures that are arrangeable over the underlying body to form an overall perimeter for the rack assembly. One or more retention structures may be provided with the plurality of rail structures, where each retention structure is configured to support one or more solar modules at a given height above the underlying body. At least some of the plurality of rail structures are adapted to enable individual rail structures o be sealed over the underlying body so as to constrain air flow underneath the solar modules. Additionally, at least one of (i) one or more of the rail structures, or (ii) the one or more retention structures are adjustable so as to adapt the rack assembly to accommodate solar modules of varying forms or dimensions.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24J 2/52 (2006.01); H01L 31/042 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02S 20/23 (2014.12); F24S 25/20 (2018.05); F24S 25/636 (2018.05); F24S 2020/17 (2018.05); F24S 2025/021 (2018.05); Y02B 10/12 (2013.01); Y02E 10/47 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006076719 A2 20060720; WO 2006076719 A3 20070111; EP 1842012 A2 20071010

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20130122

2013-01-22 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2009-08-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PVT SOLAR, INC.

2008-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080716

2008-04-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070813

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR