Global Patent Index - EP 1842016 A1

EP 1842016 A1 2007-10-10 - REFRIGERATOR AND/OR FREEZER

Title (en)

REFRIGERATOR AND/OR FREEZER

Title (de)

KÜHL- UND/ODER GEFRIERGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE REFRIGERATION ET/OU DE CONGELATION

Publication

EP 1842016 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06706398 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000637 W
  • DE 202005001177 U
  • DE 202005002231 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: KR20070095419A] The invention relates to a refrigerator and/or freezer (1) having a glass door (3) that has a door frame (5) inside of which a glazing (6) is placed. According to the invention, the refrigerator and/or freezer (1) are/is characterized in that the door frame (5) has a surrounding plastic casing that is integrally formed as a single piece.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/04 (2006.01); F25D 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/0434 (2013.01); F25D 23/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006079517A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 202005002231 U1 20060608; EP 1842016 A1 20071010; EP 1842016 B1 20150729; ES 2550619 T3 20151111; KR 20070095419 A 20070928; RU 2007132067 A 20090310; RU 2371647 C2 20091027; US 2008190046 A1 20080814; US 8312694 B2 20121120; WO 2006079517 A1 20060803

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20160502

2016-05-02 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502006014446

2016-01-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-11-11 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2550619 T3

- Effective date: 20151111

2015-09-10 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502006014446

2015-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2015-05-27 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150430

2014-07-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25D 23/02 20060101ALI20140625BHEP

2014-07-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47F 3/04 20060101AFI20140625BHEP

2014-06-25 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 502006014446

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: F25D0023020000

- IPC: A47F0003040000

2010-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100512

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-02-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070712

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT