Global Patent Index - EP 1842020 A1

EP 1842020 A1 2007-10-10 - PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER

Title (en)

PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER

Title (de)

STAPELSCHEIBEN-WÄRMETAUSCHER

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE A EMPILEMENT DE PLAQUES

Publication

EP 1842020 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06706195 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000166 W
  • DE 102005002063 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006074903A1] The invention relates to a plate heat exchanger, especially for a motor vehicle, comprising several conducting devices (3, 4), above all flat pipes, in the form of elongate disks which are stacked on top of each other, are interconnected, particularly soldered together, and are composed of two elongate half disks (41) that form a hollow space for conducting a medium therethrough. Each end of said half disks (41) is provided with a first through-hole (48; 49) for feeding or discharging the medium, said through-hole (48; 49) being disposed between two other through-holes (55, 56; 60, 61) from the perspective of the transversal direction of the half disks. In order to create a plate heat exchanger that has a simple design and can be produced at a low cost, an edge region (57, 58; 62, 63) of the other through-holes (55, 56; 60, 61) is embodied in a raised manner and is substantially provided with the shape of a pot encompassing a bottom in which the associated through-hole is recessed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/046 (2013.01); F28D 9/0043 (2013.01); F28F 9/002 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0089 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005002063 A1 20060720; BR PI0606533 A2 20090630; CN 100561102 C 20091118; CN 101103242 A 20080109; EP 1842020 A1 20071010; EP 1842020 B1 20171213; JP 2008527304 A 20080724; KR 20070097056 A 20071002; US 2008087411 A1 20080417; WO 2006074903 A1 20060720; ZA 200705420 B 20080625

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171213

2018-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171213

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171213

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180131

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-25 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-04-18 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20171213

2018-01-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-01-18 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502006015750

2018-01-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-12-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 954812 T

- Effective date: 20171215

2017-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-12-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RICHTER, JENS

2017-09-27 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170830

2015-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAHLE BEHR GMBH & CO. KG

2009-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090323

2008-04-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070814

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR