Global Patent Index - EP 1842098 A1

EP 1842098 A1 2007-10-10 - METHOD FOR REMOVING DEFECTIVE MATERIAL FROM A LITHOGRAPHY MASK

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REMOVING DEFECTIVE MATERIAL FROM A LITHOGRAPHY MASK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON DEFEKTMATERIAL EINER LITHOGRAPHIEMASKE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ELIMINATION D'UNE MATIERE RESIDUELLE SUR UN MASQUE DE LITHOGRAPHIE

Publication

EP 1842098 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06703614 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000660 W
  • DE 102005004070 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE102005004070B3] The method involves removing a defective material (40) and an absorbing material (3) of a lithographic mask in a processing zone by a focused ion beam. The mask is subjected to a cleaning process after the removal of the defective material. An absorbing material is applied in an outer region, which is dependent on a portion of the processing zone, to form a transmitting region (1) having a desired phase difference on the mask. An independent claim is also included for a lithographic mask with a transmitting region.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 1/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03F 1/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006079529A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005004070 B3 20060803; EP 1842098 A1 20071010; JP 2007534993 A 20071129; KR 100841036 B1 20080624; KR 20070042921 A 20070424; TW 200627076 A 20060801; US 2007037071 A1 20070215; WO 2006079529 A1 20060803

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080805

2009-01-21 [D18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN (DELETED)

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-05-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): FR

2008-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080125

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060829

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR