Global Patent Index - EP 1842159 A2

EP 1842159 A2 2007-10-10 - METHOD OF MERGING ART PRODUCTION AND PREPRESS

Title (en)

METHOD OF MERGING ART PRODUCTION AND PREPRESS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ZUSAMMENFÜHREN VON KUNSTPRODUKTION UND DRUCKVORBEREITUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FUSION DE PRODUCTION D'ART ET DE PRE-PRESSE

Publication

EP 1842159 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06718731 A

Priority

  • US 2006001702 W
  • US 64480405 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006078695A2] A web-based, interactive tool provides a method of linking marketing strategies to field sales and marketing. In particular, the web-based tool allows the coordination of marketing and promotional schedules, preferred design work and pricing information, among other things, to allow substantially on-demand printing of marketing and promotional materials. The web-based tool of the present invention further provides reporting capabilities regarding the production, costs, etc. regarding the promotional materials.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006078695A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006078695 A2 20060727; WO 2006078695 A3 20070524; CA 2595645 A1 20060727; EP 1842159 A2 20071010

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-08 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080728

2008-04-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071126

2008-01-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-11-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RELLAR, GARY

2007-11-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RELLAR, KENNETH, W.

2007-11-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: THOMPSON, JENNIFER

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU