Global Patent Index - EP 1842161 A2

EP 1842161 A2 2007-10-10 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCT IMPUTATION RELATING TO SAMPLE STORES

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCT IMPUTATION RELATING TO SAMPLE STORES

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR PRODUKTANRECHNUNG IN BEZUG AUF PROBENLAGER

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'ENTREE DE PRODUITS EN RELATION AVEC DES MAGASINS D'ECHANTILLONS

Publication

EP 1842161 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 05853339 A

Priority

  • US 2005044395 W
  • US 64681605 P
  • US 29359105 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006080988A2] Prescriptions are imputed or allocated to a non-reporting sample outlet in a universe of outlets that generally report prescription data to a database. Prescriptions are imputed or allocated based on the outlet's recent prescription or physician distribution. Prescription allocations to an outlet for a particular product in a product group are proportional to the ratio of the recent prescriptions for that particular product and for the product group.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 99/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006080988 A2 20060803; WO 2006080988 A3 20070920; CA 2595364 A1 20060803; EP 1842161 A2 20071010; EP 1842161 A4 20100210

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-04 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20150915

2015-09-15 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2010-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100416

2010-02-10 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100112

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-31 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20070920

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070816

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU