Global Patent Index - EP 1842187 A1

EP 1842187 A1 2007-10-10 - IRREVERSIBLE OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM COMPRISING A TRACK WITH LOW RAISED ZONES AND METHOD FOR USING SAME

Title (en)

IRREVERSIBLE OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM COMPRISING A TRACK WITH LOW RAISED ZONES AND METHOD FOR USING SAME

Title (de)

MEDIUM ZUR IRREVERSIBLEN OPTISCHEN AUFNAHME MIT EINER SPUR FÜR NIEDRIGBEREICHE UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT OPTIQUE IRREVERSIBLE COMPORTANT UNE PISTE AVEC DES ZONES EN RELIEF DE FAIBLE HAUTEUR ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION D'UN TEL SUPPORT

Publication

EP 1842187 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 06709167 A

Priority

  • FR 2006000169 W
  • FR 0500863 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2881262A1] The medium has a substrate (1) with a photosensitive layer (2) having a front side receiving optical radiations. Relief zones (1c) have height comprised between 25 nm and 35 nm for widths of the zones comprises between 250 nm and 370 nm, and another height comprised between a minimum value varying linearly between 25 and 32 nm and a maximum value of 35 nm for widths of the zones comprised between 200 and 250 nm. An independent claim is also included for a method for using a irreversible optical recording medium.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/0045 (2006.01); G11B 7/24085 (2013.01); G11B 7/243 (2013.01); G11B 7/26 (2006.01); G11B 7/253 (2006.01); G11B 7/2534 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/00452 (2013.01); G11B 7/24085 (2013.01); G11B 7/243 (2013.01); G11B 7/2534 (2013.01); G11B 2007/24304 (2013.01); G11B 2007/24316 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006079716A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2881262 A1 20060728; FR 2881262 B1 20070427; CN 101124629 A 20080213; EP 1842187 A1 20071010; JP 2008529198 A 20080731; KR 20070116788 A 20071211; US 2008260983 A1 20081023; WO 2006079716 A1 20060803

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090331

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071219

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POUPINET, LUDOVIC

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAULAGNET, FABIEN

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070711

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR