Global Patent Index - EP 1842192 A4

EP 1842192 A4 2010-02-03 - DATA TRANSMITTING METHOD, RECORDING MEDIUM, APPARATUS FOR REPRODUCING DATA FROM RECORDING MEDIUM USING LOCAL STORAGE AND METHOD THEREOF

Title (en)

DATA TRANSMITTING METHOD, RECORDING MEDIUM, APPARATUS FOR REPRODUCING DATA FROM RECORDING MEDIUM USING LOCAL STORAGE AND METHOD THEREOF

Title (de)

DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, AUFNAHMEMEDIUM, VORRICHTUNG ZUR WIEDERGABE DER DATEN VOM AUFNAHMEMEDIUM UNTER VERWENDUNG VON LOKALER SPEICHERUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT, APPAREIL POUR LA REPRODUCTION DE DONNEES A PARTIR D'UN SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT UTILISANT UNE MEMOIRE LOCALE ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1842192 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 06700342 A

Priority

  • KR 2006000030 W
  • US 64458805 P
  • KR 20050109693 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006078099A2] A method of transmitting encrypted data, recording medium including the encrypted data, apparatus for reproducing the same using a local storage and method thereof are disclosed. The present invention includes downloading a data associated with the recording medium to the local storage, constructing a virtual package by binding the downloaded data to a disc package within the recording medium, decrypting an indexing item of an index table within the virtual package using a key within a key file associated with the recording medium, and reproducing the decrypted indexing item, wherein information for solving a mismatch that occurs between the indexing item of the index table and an indexing item of the key file is included in the virtual package. By the present invention, the data associated with the recording medium is downloaded from outside to the local storage while contents provided by a content provider are protected. And, both of the data within the recording medium and the data within the local storage can be efficiently reproduced using a virtual package. Therefore, the present invention can provide more convenient functions to a user.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 20/00 (2006.01); G06F 21/00 (2006.01); G11B 27/10 (2006.01); G11B 27/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 27/11 (2013.01); G11B 20/00086 (2013.01); G11B 20/00224 (2013.01); G11B 20/00253 (2013.01); G11B 20/00528 (2013.01); G11B 20/00869 (2013.01); G11B 27/329 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2541 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 2004030356 A1 20040408 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al & EP 1553769 A1 20050713 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]
  • [PX] WO 2005074187 A1 20050811 - SONY CORP [JP], et al & EP 1710950 A1 20061011 - SONY CORP [JP]
  • [A] INTEL CORPORATION ET AL: "Advanced Access Content System (AACS). Technical Overview (informative)", INTERNET CITATION, 21 July 2004 (2004-07-21), pages 32pp, XP007910652, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.aacsla.com/marketplace/evaluating/aacs_technical_overview_ 040721.pdf> [retrieved on 20090316]
  • [A] BLU-RAY DISC FOUNDERS: "White paper Blu-ray Disc Format 2. A logical and audio visual application format specifications for BD-RE", INTERNET CITATION, August 2004 (2004-08-01), XP002480404, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://wwww.hi-def.ru/file_download/5> [retrieved on 20080515]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006078099 A2 20060727; WO 2006078099 A3 20060908; EP 1842192 A2 20071010; EP 1842192 A4 20100203

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150801

2011-12-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20111123

2010-02-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100105

2010-02-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G11B 20/00 20060101AFI20091228BHEP

2010-02-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G11B 27/32 20060101ALI20091228BHEP

2010-02-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G11B 27/10 20060101ALI20091228BHEP

2010-02-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 21/00 20060101ALI20091228BHEP

2008-04-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR