Global Patent Index - EP 1842264 A1

EP 1842264 A1 2007-10-10 - DEVICE FOR EMITTING AND RECEIVING ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR EMITTING AND RECEIVING ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSSENDEN UND EMPFANGEN ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER STRAHLUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR EMETTRE ET RECEVOIR UN RAYONNEMENT ELECTROMAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 1842264 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06707679 A

Priority

  • EP 2006050095 W
  • DE 102005002505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CN101107751A] The invention relates to a device for emitting and receiving electromagnetic radiation, particularly microwave radiation, which has at least one supplying element, at least one wave guide, and at least one rod radiator. The supplying element is placed at a first end of the wave guide in such a manner that the power radiated by the supplying element is guided through the wave guide or that the received power guided through the wave guide is injected into the supplying element. The rod radiator is placed at a second end of the wave guide in such a manner that the emitted power guided through the wave guide is bundled and radiated by the rod radiator or that the incoming received power is bundled by the rod radiator and directed into the wave guide.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/24 (2006.01); H01Q 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 25/007 (2013.01); H01Q 13/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006077184A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005002505 A1 20060727; CN 101107751 A 20080116; EP 1842264 A1 20071010; JP 2008527939 A 20080724; US 2009121954 A1 20090514; WO 2006077184 A1 20060727

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2010-09-01 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20100216

2008-04-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071106

2007-11-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070820

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT