Global Patent Index - EP 1842311 A1

EP 1842311 A1 2007-10-10 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING RIGHTS EXPRESSIONS BY STAKEHOLDERS OF AN ITEM

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING RIGHTS EXPRESSIONS BY STAKEHOLDERS OF AN ITEM

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONTROLLE DES AUSDRÜCKENS VON RECHTEN DURCH ANSPRUCHSBERECHTIGTE EINES GEGENSTANDS

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DES EXPRESSIONS DES DROITS MIS EN OEUVRE PAR LES DEPOSITAIRES D'UN OBJET

Publication

EP 1842311 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 03809657 A

Priority

US 0319985 W

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 21/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1842311 A1 20071010; EP 1842311 A4 20090121

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-08 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20150416

2015-04-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTENTGUARD HOLDINGS, INC.

2015-04-16 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2011-08-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GILLIAM, CHARLES, P.

2011-08-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHEN, EDDIE, J.

2009-04-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090306

2009-01-21 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20081222

2009-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 1/00 20060101AFI20081216BHEP

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040504

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR