Global Patent Index - EP 1842343 A1

EP 1842343 A1 2007-10-10 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE ROUTING DIRECTION OF ETHERNET FRAMES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE ROUTING DIRECTION OF ETHERNET FRAMES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER WEITERLEITUNGSRICHTUNG VON ETHERNET-FRAMES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER LA DIRECTION DE TRANSMISSION DE TRAMES ETHERNET

Publication

EP 1842343 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06700604 A

Priority

  • EP 2006050011 W
  • DE 102005002358 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006077173A1] The invention relates to a method for determining the routing direction of Ethernet frames in order to route them to a destination, e.g. a computer, by means of Ethernet switches, according to which a frame is received by a first switch (Sl). The first switch (Sl) determines that the source address of the frames is not a destination address that has been registered in the switch (Sl) for the routing of frames. The source address is registered by the first switch (Sl) as a new destination address (X) for the routing of frames. The first switch (Sl) then communicates the new destination address (X) to a second Ethernet switch (S2, S3) and when the destination address (X) has been received, the second switch (S2, S3) defines a routing direction for the frames to the new destination in the destination address (X).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 45/123 (2013.01); H04L 45/02 (2013.01); H04L 45/18 (2013.01); H04L 45/20 (2013.01); H04L 45/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006077173A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006077173 A1 20060727; CN 101147367 A 20080319; DE 102005002358 A1 20060824; EP 1842343 A1 20071010; KR 20070103435 A 20071023; US 2008304480 A1 20081211

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080410

2008-04-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071129

2007-12-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2007-11-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A.

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070820

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR