Global Patent Index - EP 1842439 A1

EP 1842439 A1 2007-10-10 - Cigar tube

Title (en)

Cigar tube

Title (de)

Zigarrenhülle

Title (fr)

Tube de cigare

Publication

EP 1842439 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07006473 A

Priority

IT MI20060647 A

Abstract (en)

A cigar tube (1) comprises two circular cylindrical tubular bodies open at one end whereat they are interconnected by mutual engagement to form a closed cigar tube. A first tubular body (2) has a first portion (2a) having the same cross section as the second tubular body (3) and a second portion (2b) extending from the open end, whose cross section is smaller than that of the first portion (2a), allowing it to be fitted into the open end of said second tubular body with a slight press fit, the first portion (2a) and the second portion (2b) of the first tubular body (2) being interconnected by a tapered section (2c).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24F 15/12 (2006.01); A24F 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24F 15/12 (2013.01); A24F 15/20 (2013.01); A45C 11/22 (2013.01); A45C 11/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1842439 A1 20071010; IT MI20060647 A1 20071004

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080411

2008-07-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INDUSTRIE BARATTA S.R.L.

2008-06-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU