Global Patent Index - EP 1842473 A2

EP 1842473 A2 2007-10-10 - Electric motor housing for a vacuum cleaner fan assembly

Title (en)

Electric motor housing for a vacuum cleaner fan assembly

Title (de)

Elektromotorgehäuse für eine Staubsaugergebläseeinheit

Title (fr)

Logement de moteur électrique pour l'unité soufflante d'un aspirateur

Publication

EP 1842473 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07250885 A

Priority

GB 0606838 A

Abstract (en)

A housing for an electric motor for driving a fan for a vacuum cleaner, comprising respective parts fitting together so that at least part of the housing comprises spaced inner and outer walls between which exhaust flow of air from the fan takes place, wherein there is provided at least one formation extending into the space between the inner and outer walls to cause the air to flow in an elongated flow path therebetween.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/00 (2006.01); A47L 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/0081 (2013.01); A47L 9/22 (2013.01); F04D 25/082 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1842473 A2 20071010; EP 1842473 A3 20080514; AU 2007200836 A1 20071025; CN 101051772 A 20071010; GB 0606838 D0 20060517; GB 2436787 A 20071010; RU 2007112578 A 20081020; US 2007243087 A1 20071018

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090526

2009-01-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081114

2008-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081007

2008-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2008-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47L 9/00 20060101AFI20080410BHEP

2008-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47L 9/22 20060101ALI20080410BHEP

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU