Global Patent Index - EP 1842607 A3

EP 1842607 A3 2007-10-17 - Method for investment casing of metallic moulded parts and device therefor

Title (en)

Method for investment casing of metallic moulded parts and device therefor

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Feingiessen von metallischen Formteilen und Vorrichtung hierfür

Title (fr)

Procédé de soudure fin de pièce de formage métallique et procédé approprié

Publication

EP 1842607 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 07450060 A

Priority

AT 5702006 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1842607A2] The fine casting of profiled metal parts or several dimensionally identical metal parts in which a metal melt is cast in a ceramic mold, and cooled under pressure for a maximum of 30 seconds and allowed to solidify. During solidification the melt can be subjected to ultrasonic vibration or a variable stress (sic, Wechselspannung). An independent claim is included for a device for fine casting of profiled parts.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 27/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 27/13 (2013.01); B22D 27/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1842607 A2 20071010; EP 1842607 A3 20071017; AT 503391 A1 20071015; AT 503391 B1 20081015; US 2008011442 A1 20080117

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130103

2011-12-21 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20110915

2011-12-21 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20120702

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080218

2008-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080121

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU