Global Patent Index - EP 1842715 A1

EP 1842715 A1 2007-10-10 - RECLINING ADJUSTER

Title (en)

RECLINING ADJUSTER

Title (de)

Rücklehnenneigungseinsteller

Title (fr)

Dispositif de réglage d'inclinaison

Publication

EP 1842715 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06712502 A

Priority

  • JP 2006301336 W
  • JP 2005019945 A

Abstract (en)

A reclining adjuster has a lower bracket fixed to a seat cushion; an upper bracket fixed to a seatback and connected to the lower bracket so as to be rotatable about a shaft; a lock mechanism capable of having a locked state where rotation of the upper bracket relative to the lower bracket is locked and a released state where the lock is released; and an emergency lock mechanism for preventing relative rotation between the lock mechanism and the upper bracket when it occurs. In the emergency lock mechanism, when a cam projection of an outer toothed ring gear is pressed in the circumferential direction by a cam pin of a disk member by the relative rotation therebetween, the outer toothed ring gear meshes with both inner teeth of the lower bracket and inner teeth of the upper bracket.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60N 2/22 (2006.01); A47C 1/025 (2006.01); F16D 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60N 2/2231 (2013.01); B60N 2/2227 (2013.01); B60N 2/433 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1842715 A1 20071010; EP 1842715 A4 20101006; EP 1842715 B1 20120111; JP 2006204506 A 20060810; JP 4998867 B2 20120815; US 2008164741 A1 20080710; US 7850243 B2 20101214; WO 2006080446 A1 20060803

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121012

2012-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2012-01-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2011-05-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60N 2/22 20060101AFI20110421BHEP

2011-05-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47C 1/025 20060101ALI20110421BHEP

2011-05-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F16D 63/00 20060101ALI20110421BHEP

2010-10-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100906

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-04-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070727

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT