Global Patent Index - EP 1842770 A2

EP 1842770 A2 2007-10-10 - Articulated platform for a turret

Title (en)

Articulated platform for a turret

Title (de)

Schwenkbare Plattform für einen Drehturm

Title (fr)

Plateforme orientable pour une tourelle

Publication

EP 1842770 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07105646 A

Priority

IT MI20060668 A

Abstract (en)

An auxiliary aiming device for installation on a mobile or fixed platform, e.g. for a naval emplacement, comprises an articulated platform (20) carrying a turret (11). The articulated platform (20) is able to be commanded to recline by a predetermined angle.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63G 1/00 (2006.01); A62C 31/24 (2006.01); B63G 13/00 (2006.01); F41A 23/20 (2006.01); G12B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63G 1/00 (2013.01); B63G 13/00 (2013.01); F41A 23/20 (2013.01); F41A 23/56 (2013.01); F41A 23/58 (2013.01); A62C 31/24 (2013.01); B63B 2017/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1842770 A2 20071010; EP 1842770 A3 20080305; IL 182308 D0 20070920; IT MI20060668 A1 20071006; SG 136114 A1 20071029; US 2008110326 A1 20080515

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-01 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1105931

2009-08-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090225

2008-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081014

2008-11-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-11-12 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20080829

- Countries: AL

2008-11-12 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20080829

- Countries: BA

2008-11-12 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20080829

- Countries: HR

2008-11-12 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20080829

- Countries: MK

2008-11-12 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20080829

- Countries: RS

2008-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080829

2008-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-03-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2008-02-29 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1105931

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU