Global Patent Index - EP 1842773 A2

EP 1842773 A2 2007-10-10 - Machine for filling cups with foodstuffs and semi-luxury food

Title (en)

Machine for filling cups with foodstuffs and semi-luxury food

Title (de)

Maschine zum Füllen von Bechern mit Nahrungs-und Genussmitteln

Title (fr)

Machine destinée au remplissage de pots contenant des aliments et denrées de luxe

Publication

EP 1842773 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07006552 A

Priority

DE 102006015638 A

Abstract (en)

The machine (1) has two product streams (A, A`, B, B`, C, C`) within an area of dosing stations (3, 3`, 3 ``). A controlled filling process is accomplished in an area of dosing components. A programmable control (8) is provided, where the programmable control works together with the dosing components in such a manner that variable filling structures are produced in horizontally supplied cups (2, 2``) to a large extent using controlled rotatable and/or hub guidances of filling nozzles.

Abstract (de)

Eine Maschine zum Füllen von Bechern mit Nahrungs- und Genußmitteln ist so ausgebildet, daß zumindest zwei Produktströme (A,A';B,B';C,C') mittels jeweiliger Fülldüsen (7) in bereitgestellte Becher (2') eingeleitet werden. Dieser Füllvorgang ist im Bereich einer die Fülldüsen aufweisenden Dosierstation (3,3',3") ausführbar. Die Maschine weist erfindungsgemäß eine programmierbare Steuerung (8) auf, mit der weitgehend variable Füllstrukturen in den Bechern mittels gesteuerter Schwenk- und/oder Hubbewegungen (H',S) erzeugbar sind.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 3/32 (2006.01); B65B 39/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 3/04 (2013.01); B65B 3/26 (2013.01); B65B 3/326 (2013.01); B65B 39/12 (2013.01); B65B 57/00 (2013.01); B65B 2039/009 (2013.01); B65B 2220/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006015638 A1 20071011; AT 500136 T 20110315; DE 502007006575 D1 20110414; DK 1842773 T3 20110606; EP 1842773 A2 20071010; EP 1842773 A3 20080220; EP 1842773 B1 20110302; ES 2359888 T3 20110527; SI 1842773 T1 20110630; US 2007235104 A1 20071011; US 8167005 B2 20120501

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170320

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170310

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170314

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170328

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20170308

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170302

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170301

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170330

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-09-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: NSM PACKTEC GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 500136 T

- Effective date: 20160725

2016-03-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-11-30 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: NSM PACKTEC GMBH; DE

- Effective date: 20151023

2015-11-03 [REG SK TC4A] CHANGE OF OWNER'S NAME

- Owner name: NSM PACKTEC GMBH, AHAUS, DE

- Document: SK E 9362

- Effective date: 20150929

2015-08-14 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: NSM PACKTEC GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20150709

2015-08-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: NSM PACKTEC GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20150709

2015-07-24 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: NSM PACKTEC GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20150623

2015-07-15 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: NSM PACKTEC GMBH

- Effective date: 20150709

2015-07-15 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150703

2015-07-15 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150703

2015-05-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NSM PACKTEC GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FINNAH ENGINEERING UND PACKAGING GMBH, 48683 AHAUS, DE

- Document: DE 502007006575

- Effective date: 20110203

2015-05-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NSM PACKTEC GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FINNAH PACKTEC GMBH, 48683 AHAUS, DE

- Document: DE 502007006575

- Effective date: 20150410

2015-05-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007006575

- Representative's name: BUSSE & BUSSE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTN, DE

- Effective date: 20150410

2015-04-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007006575

- Representative's name: BUSSE & BUSSE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTN, DE

2015-04-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150312 AND 20150318

2013-10-31 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110329

2012-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20120306

- Year of fee payment: 6

2012-03-29 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007006575

- Effective date: 20111205

2012-02-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111205

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-30 [PG25 MT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-11-30 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110702

2011-11-30 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110704

2011-10-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FINNAH PACKTEC G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-09-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2011-08-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110602

2011-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-08-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-08-04 [REG SK T3] TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAKIAN

- Document: SK E 9362

2011-07-29 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-07-29 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-07-29 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2011-07-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20110401158

- Effective date: 20110614

2011-06-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2011-06-08 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2011-06-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2011-05-27 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2359888 T3

- Effective date: 20110527

2011-04-14 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007006575

- Effective date: 20110414

2011-04-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007006575 P 20110414

2011-03-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2011-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-09-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MACHINE FOR FILLING CUPS WITH FOODSTUFFS AND SEMI-LUXURY FOOD

2010-07-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FINNAH PACKTEC GMBH

2009-12-30 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-30 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20100524

2008-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081027

2008-10-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080820

2008-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-02-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU