Global Patent Index - EP 1842780 A1

EP 1842780 A1 2007-10-10 - System comprising a packaging and cargo to be packaged

Title (en)

System comprising a packaging and cargo to be packaged

Title (de)

Kombination eines Transportguts und einer Transportverpackung für das Transportgut

Title (fr)

Emballage de transport avec un produit de transport

Publication

EP 1842780 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07004971 A

Priority

DE 102006016152 A

Abstract (en)

The package has a covering box (108) and front side pads (138) that are arranged between a transport good and a wall of the box. The transport good is supported in a support area of the pads. The pads are provided in the support area with an opening (266) for local reduction of rigidity of the pads. A horizontal section of a reinforcing unit is arranged with closed covering box in an intermediate space between free edges of inner closing flaps and between an upper side of a cover strip and a lower side of an outer closing flap of the box.

Abstract (de)

Um eine Transportverpackung für ein Transportgut, insbesondere eine Spüle (102), umfassend eine Umverpackung (108) und mindestens ein Polsterelement (138), das zwischen dem Transportgut und einer Wand der Umverpackung angeordnet ist, wobei sich das Transportgut an einem Abstützbereich des Polsterelements abstützt, zu schaffen, welche mit geringem Materialaufwand herstellbar ist, wird vorgeschlagen, dass das Polsterelement (138) in dem Abstützbereich mit mindestens einer Ausnehmung (266) zur lokalen Verringerung der Steifigkeit des Polsterelements (138) versehen ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/505 (2013.01); B65D 85/64 (2013.01); B65D 2585/645 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1842780 A1 20071010; DE 102006016152 A1 20071011

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100330

2009-12-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SYSTEM COMPRISING A PACKAGING AND CARGO TO BE PACKAGED

2009-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090105

2008-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080318

2008-07-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-06-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU