Global Patent Index - EP 1842822 A2

EP 1842822 A2 2007-10-10 - Crane and method of assembling it

Title (en)

Crane and method of assembling it

Title (de)

Kran und Montageverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Grue et son procédé d'assemblage

Publication

EP 1842822 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07105272 A

Priority

IT PR20060033 A

Abstract (en)

A crane (50) and a method of assembling it, which crane is of the type that comprises a tower (T), at whose top a slewing member supports a counter-jib (CF) and a jib (F) for lifting and handling loads. A hoist means (58) loads and positions the different elements (E0, ... E14) of the jib (F) on corresponding sliding means of the counterjib (CF) for successive assembly of the jib (F).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/28 (2006.01); B66C 23/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/283 (2013.01); B66C 23/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1842822 A2 20071010; EP 1842822 A3 20090218; IT PR20060033 A1 20071006

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090819

2009-12-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66C 23/28 20060101AFI20070725BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66C 23/34 20060101ALI20090108BHEP

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU