Global Patent Index - EP 1842824 A2

EP 1842824 A2 2007-10-10 - Industrial truck with a load carrying device

Title (en)

Industrial truck with a load carrying device

Title (de)

Flurförderzeug mit einem Lasttragmittel

Title (fr)

Chariots de manutention dotés d'un moyen de support de charges

Publication

EP 1842824 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07004312 A

Priority

DE 102006014447 A

Abstract (en)

The truck (10) has a loading rod (20), a loading fork (22), and a radio frequency identification (RFID) transmitting and receiving unit, whose transmitting and receiving area is arranged on the area of the rod and the loading fork. A fork occupancy sensor is provided to detect load on the loading fork. A control unit initiates an activation of the transmitting and receiving unit for receiving data from an external radio frequency identification transponder, when the load is detected by the sensor.

Abstract (de)

Flurförderzeug mit einem Lasttragmittel (20,22), einer Sende- und Empfangseinheit (34), deren Sende- und Empfangsbereich (32) auf einen Bereich des Lasttragmittels (22) und auf einen Bereich vor dem Lasttragemittel (20,22) gerichtet ist, und einer Steuereinheit (36), die die Sende- und Empfangseinheit (34) für den Empfang von Daten von externen Sendern aktiviert, wobei ein Sensor (38) vorgesehen ist, der eine Last (30) auf dem Lasttragmittel (22) detektiert und durch die Steuereinheit (36) eine Aktivierung der Sende- und Empfangseinheit (34) auslöst, wenn der Sensor eine Last detektiert hat, wobei der Sensor in ein Gehäuse (24) für die Sende- und Empfangseinheit (34) integriert ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/075 (2006.01); H01Q 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/2208 (2013.01); B66F 9/0755 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1842824 A2 20071010; EP 1842824 A3 20071024; EP 1842824 B1 20091125; CN 101045519 A 20071003; CN 101045519 B 20130501; DE 102006014447 A1 20071004; DE 502007002088 D1 20100107; US 2007233314 A1 20071004; US 7761210 B2 20100720

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170330

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100826

2010-02-12 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2010-01-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007002088 P 20100107

2009-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-11-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-11-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JUNGHEINRICH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071005

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU