Global Patent Index - EP 1842947 A1

EP 1842947 A1 2007-10-10 - Process for knitting a garment

Title (en)

Process for knitting a garment

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Stricken eines Kleidungsstücks

Title (fr)

Procédé de tricotage d'un vêtement

Publication

EP 1842947 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06007087 A

Priority

EP 06007087 A

Abstract (en)

Starting at the initial knitted row (151) of the border (105), up to the last of the border rows (152), the border is knitted separately from the knitted piece, but on the same flat bed knitting machine. Stitches of the last border row (152) are connected with stitches in the last row of knitting (125, 125') in the piece, using a looping technique. The knitted piece and the border (of which there may be more than one) are knitted on the same needle bed, but in different parts of it. The border is ribbed. The border is knitted after completing the last row of the knitted piece. The last row of the knitted piece and the last knitted row of the border are formed using a different number of knitting needles. The knitted piece and the border are produced as knitted hose. The border is alternatively produced as a flat knit, and is connected to a flat section of the knitted piece. The knitted piece is formed by using each second needle. It can be produced as a tubular knitted hose, the border being produced as a flat knit. The knitted piece is formed by immediately-adjacent needles. An independent claim IS INCLUDED FOR the corresponding knitted piece, especially an item of knitted clothing.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Herstellung eines mit zumindest einem sich über mehrere Strickreihen erstreckenden Gestrickabschluss versehenen Kleidungsstücks auf einer Flachstrickmaschine, bei dem ein Gestrickstück bis zu einer letzten Gestrickstückstrickreihe (25, 25'), an die sich der Gestrickabschluss (5) anschließen soll, gestrickt wird, wird der Gestrickabschluss (5) beginnend mit seiner Startstrickreihe (51, 51') bis zu einer letzten Gestrickabschlussstrickreihe (52, 52') von dem Gestrickstück getrennt auf derselben Flachstrickmaschine gestrickt und werden die Maschen der letzten Gestrickabschlussstrickreihe (52, 52') mit den Maschen der letzten Gestrickstückstrickreihe (25, 25') mittels einer Ketteltechnik miteinander verbunden. Dadurch ergibt sich eine einheitliche Elastizität der Gestrickabschlüsse.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/246 (2013.01); D04B 1/106 (2013.01); D10B 2501/061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1842947 A1 20071010; EP 1842947 B1 20090701; CN 101130916 A 20080227; CN 101130916 B 20130925; DE 502006004124 D1 20090813; ES 2327261 T3 20091027

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502006004124

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502006004124

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130417

- Year of fee payment: 8

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110405

2012-06-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120604

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100415

- Year of fee payment: 5

2010-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100406

2009-10-27 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2327261 T3

2009-08-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006004124 P 20090813

2009-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2008-06-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2008-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080129

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU